HI HB83 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 212, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 212, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Interagency Council on Homelessness, in conjunction with and with the advisement of the Department of Human Services and Department of Land and Natural Resources, to establish a working group to examine and develop recommendations related to the establishment of safe zones for persons experiencing homelessness. Requires the working group to submit a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (HB83 CD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 212, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 212, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 127). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 127) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Keith-Agaran, S. Chang, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Gates, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran, S. Chang Co-Chairs; Espero, Shimabukuro. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Gates Co-Chairs; Todd, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 546) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, K. Rhoads . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 79). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-10-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |