HI HB83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB83
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees with written notice of the employee's shift schedule at least ten calendar days before the employee is scheduled to work, under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Fair Scheduling.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB83 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB648 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
SB648 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=83&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB83_.HTM |