HI HB834 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB834
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Public Safety to establish a temporary sheriff patrol program and the Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness to establish a program contracting private security for the enforcement of laws and rules prohibiting trespassing, camping, or being present after closing hours on certain state real property. (HB834 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB834 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Subjects
Enforcement
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Private Security ($)
Temporary Sheriff Patrol Program
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Private Security ($)
Temporary Sheriff Patrol Program