HI HB836 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB836
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of refuse collection vehicles near or within residential zones except between the hours of 7:00 a.m. and 10:00 p.m. on any weekday and Saturday, and between the hours of 8:00 a.m. and 10:00 p.m. on Sunday and any state or federal holiday.
Title
Relating To Noise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 32 |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB836 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=836&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB836_.HTM |