HI HB839 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1323).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1323).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct an audit of the Special Land and Development Fund and Land Conservation Fund of the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Appropriates funds. (HB839 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1323). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1323). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 181). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 181) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Kong, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-24-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224. |
2017-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Kong, Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 147). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Audit
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Land Conservation Fund
Special Land and Development Fund
Audit
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Land Conservation Fund
Special Land and Development Fund