HI HB84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB84
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the parking of vehicles in front of a mailbox facing a state highway to which the United States Postal Service delivers mail from Monday through Saturday between 7:30 a.m. and 4:30 p.m. in any county with a population of 500,000 or more.
Title
Relating To Traffic Infractions.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB84 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB619 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
SB619 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=84&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB84_.HTM |