HI HB841 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 190, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 190, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Insurance Code by streamlining and improving the operations of the Insurance Division of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs and ensuring that the Insurance Division retains its accreditation with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners. (SD1)
Title
Insurance; Insurance Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 190, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 190, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 764). |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2013-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 758). |
2013-04-30 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kawakami, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 534) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 287). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-11-13 3:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Same As) 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).