HI HB846 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB846
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Re-referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Re-referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii sister-state committee to evaluate, develop recommendations, and establish a sister-state relationship with the Department of Vosges, France.
Title
Relating To Sister-state Relationships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB846 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Re-referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Biffontaine
Bruyeres
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Vosges
Establishment
France
Sister-State Relationship
Bruyeres
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Vosges
Establishment
France
Sister-State Relationship
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=846&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB846_.HTM |