HI HB847 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB847
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Ocean-friendly Capitol Program to encourage offices within the State Capitol to commit to ocean-friendly practices. Appropriates funds for the installation of ocean-friendly measures in the State Capitol. (HB847 HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB847 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
SB1067 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB1067 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to GVO, WAM.