HI HB852 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 122, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 122, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii State Energy Office and Chief Energy Officer position in Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism (DBEDT). Repeals Director of DBEDT's function as Energy Resources Coordinator and Renewable Energy Facilitator. Transfers Coordinator, Facilitator, and existing DBEDT energy office employees and functions to the Office. Amends allowable uses and funding amount of the Energy Security Special Fund. Appropriates operating funds and establishes position ceilings for the Office. Appropriates funds for a carbon pricing study. (HB852 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii State Energy Office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 122, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 122, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 118). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 4:33PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Luke Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 791) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Ihara, Inouye, Kim, Moriwaki, Ruderman. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from EET/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-19 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Hawaii State Energy Office
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Hawaii State Energy Office