HI HB858 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 220, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 220, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the termination of residential rental agreements in cases of domestic violence. Specifies additional procedures under the residential landlord-tenant code for instances of domestic violence. (HB858 CD1)
Title
Landlord-Tenant Code; Domestic Violence; Residential Rental Agreements; Early Termination
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act 220, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). |
2015-07-10 | House | Act 220, on 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). |
2015-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 656). |
2015-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7). |
2015-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, McDermott. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Har, San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:25AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Nakashima. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-09-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |