HI HB859 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Community Development Authority to establish complete streets rules and provides for input from a county whose highway lands are affected by a proposal that includes complete streets for community development districts. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB859 HD3)
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Complete Streets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EGH/PSM/TIA, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 295). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2, with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused. |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-30-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1090 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.