HI HB859 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health (DOH) to maintain a forum on its website where specified state-licensed care facilities may post vacancy information. Requires DOH to convene a working group to discuss and provide feedback on the implementation and maintenance of the forum and posting of vacancy information. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Department of Health; Website; Care-home Vacancy; Working Group; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HSH/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HSH/HTH, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 88). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-18-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |