HI HB860 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB860
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Agribusiness Development Corporation for the acquisition of certain property, provided that the price does not exceed the amount appropriated. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land And Building Acquisition.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Acquisition
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Agricultural Land
Appropriation ($)
Kunia Dow Dupont Pioneer Land
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Agricultural Land
Appropriation ($)
Kunia Dow Dupont Pioneer Land