HI HB861 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a general fund appropriation of $25,000,000 for fiscal year 2014-2015 to recapitalize the Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund.
Title
Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund; Recapitalization ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1092 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Act 266, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=861&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB861_.htm |