HI HB862 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB862
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that exclusive representatives of public employees are not required to provide grievance representation to collective bargaining unit members who neither pay dues nor dues equivalents and who decline to pay reasonable costs of the representation. (HB862 HD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB862 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).