HI HB877 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 75, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 75, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the directors of the Departments of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, Health, Human Services, and Labor and Industrial Relations to delegate voting authority to their designees for a specified meeting or meetings. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange; Hawaii Health Connector; Board of Directors; Designee's Voting Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Act 75, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2013-05-24 | House | Act 075, on 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2013-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 750). |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 735). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-01-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1108 (Same As) 2013-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.