HI HB888 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 058, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 058, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the operations of the Maui Health System. (HB888 CD2)
Title
Making Appropriations To The Maui Health System.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 058, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 058, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2019-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888). |
2019-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970). |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-02-19. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report filed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 24 offered. |
2019-04-30 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused. |
2019-04-30 | House | Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Belatti. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 109). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, S. Chang, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, Hashimoto, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Nishimoto added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 793) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1922) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 84). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |