HI HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 248, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 248, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes liability for a person who is responsible for real property and allows an individual to possess or set off illegal aerial devices on the real property. Establishes criminal penalties. Clarifies that probable cause for arrest for fireworks offenses may be based on statements from witnesses and photographs, video, and other recordings. (HB89 CD1)
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 248, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 248, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1350). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 89). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 89) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, C. Lee, Gates, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 2:05PM in conference room 016. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Kidani Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Gates discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Kong, McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 696) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee on JDC/WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee on JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1170) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB973 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM, JDC.