HI HB904 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a minor may consent to emergency shelter if a provider of no cost emergency shelter and services is coordinating with child welfare service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB230 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback