HI HB909 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force that is to be convened by the department of health to study and make recommendations on elective pre-term pregnancy deliveries and point-of-care newborn screening. Appropriates funds to reimburse members of the task force for travel and other expenses. (SD2)
Title
Infant Mortality; Elective Pre-Term Deliveries; Point-of-Care Newborn Screening; Task Force; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 1:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 541) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-13 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 306). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 10:30AM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HTH, WAM.