HI HB917 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB917
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the City and County of Honolulu to transfer to the Department of Education fee simple title to the property on which the Department's Student Transportation Service Office - Young Street is located. Appropriates funds. (HB917 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public School Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from LHE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 131) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Wildberger, Thielen. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Johanson, Ohno, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/WLH on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB917 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM.