HI HB919 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB919
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a collective bargaining unit for graduate student assistants employed by the University of Hawaii. (HB919 HD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB919 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).