HI HB921 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 654).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 654).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows 999-year homestead leases to be assigned to land trusts that are created for purposes of managing and holding the homestead leasehold estate for the benefit of the lessee and lessee's family members. Allows trustee of land trust to assume obligations of lessee. (SD2)
Title
999-year Homestead Lease; Assignment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 654). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 416). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-30 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 638). | |
2010-04-29 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-29 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 634). | |
2010-04-28 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-10. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 627). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Ito, Carroll, Har (Co-)Chairman; Thielen. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Carroll, Har Co-Chairs; Thielen. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Taniguchi, Kim, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 402) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from JGO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3043) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Slom. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-30 | (S) Re-Referred to WTL, JGO/WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2009-03-23 | (S) The committee on WTL will reconsider its previous decision on HB 921 HD1 and will hold a public decision making on 03-25-09 2:45 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-09 3:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 175). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, C. Lee, Luke, Morita. | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-27-09. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-23-09 9:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, referral sheet 18 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |