HI HB921 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines the roles and responsibilities of the executive office on early learning and the department of education as they relate to the implementation of the public prekindergarten program. Establishes the executive office on early learning as the administrative authority for state funded prekindergarten programs and a support for and with the department of education special education, Title I, and private partnership funded prekindergarten programs to ensure high quality early education programs in department of education school classrooms. Ensures that agreements and services are clearly articulated in a memorandum of understanding between the executive office on early learning and the department of education, including a resolution protocol to settle disputes should either party not be able to come to an agreement. Establishes reporting requirements. Authorizes the state public charter school commission to establish and fund charter school prekindergarten classrooms. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 801) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2055) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Taniguchi.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 428).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback