HI HB933 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB933
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a crisis intervention and diversion program in the department of health to divert those in need to appropriate health care and away from the criminal justice system.
Title
Relating To Crisis Intervention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB933 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=933&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB933_.HTM |