HI HB940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB940
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR/EDB/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR/EDB/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new agricultural enterprise program within the department of agriculture to plan, design, construct, operate, manage, maintain, repair, demolish, and remove infrastructure on any lands under the jurisdiction of the department, to support and promote agriculture. Creates three new positions to implement the program. Establishes the agricultural enterprise special fund. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2019.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Enterprises.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB940 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR/EDB/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1167 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
SB1167 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=940&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB940_.HTM |