HI HB942 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 099, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for claims against the State, its officers, and its employees. (HB942 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making Appropriations For Claims Against The State, Its Officers, Or Its Employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 099, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).
2019-06-12HouseAct 099, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McKelvey voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 201).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 201) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-18SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-19 3:35PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 902).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 811).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 803) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 431).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1247) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McKelvey voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:20PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1169 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JDC, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback