HI HB950 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the Department of the Attorney General a program responsible for issuing credentials to allow qualified law enforcement officers and retired officers to carry concealed firearms in this State as permitted by the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act, as amended. (HB950 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB950 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB1177 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB1177 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM, JDC.