HI HB963 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB963
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to enter into ninety-nine-year leases of units in residential condominiums located on state lands.
Title
Relating To Leasehold Condominiums On Lands Controlled By The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB963 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1190 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 423.
SB1190 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=963&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB963_.HTM |