HI HB979 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 701).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 701).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Uses certain special funds to support invasive species control and mitigation and to promote reforestation and sediment run-off mitigation. Sunsets June 30, 2013. (HB979 CD1)
Title
Environment; Invasive Species; Reforestation; Sediment Run-off
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 701). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 209, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 463). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morita. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-10 2:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Morita, Har Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Gabbard, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2998) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hee, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Hooser ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) Reported from WTL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2678) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hooser, Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/ENE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-18-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 180). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wooley voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Tokioka. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 19 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |