HI HB979 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "dependent-beneficiary" under the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund to conform with the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010. Brings references to marriages under the EUTF into conformance with the state Civil Unions Law. (HB979 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund Compliance With Federal And State Laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 243).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1205 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback