HI HB980 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 74, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 74, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of mobile electronic devices while operating a motor vehicle in the State and establishes monetary penalties. Effective 7/1/13. (SD2)
Title
Highway Safety; Use of Mobile Electronic Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Act 74, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2013-05-24 | House | Act 074, on 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2013-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 750). |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 735). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Kidani. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Yamane, Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TIA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TIA/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 311). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 911) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1211 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to TIA/JDL, WAM.