HI HB984 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB984
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Meets National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) accreditation requirements by adopting the NAIC Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Model Act and adopting revisions to the NAIC Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act. (HB984 HD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB984 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB1210 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 071, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
SB1210 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 071, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
Subjects
Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Model Act
Insurance
Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act
NAIC
Insurance
Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act
NAIC