HI HB988 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Environmental Response Revolving Fund to support the operations of an environmental disaster standby and response facility in the State for the recovery and rehabilitation of native wildlife due to oil- or fuel-related disaster. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB988 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Response Revolving Fund; Wildlife Rehabilitation and Recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
2013-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1374).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Fale, Har, Jordan, Morikawa, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Oshiro voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Solomon, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Solomon, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ruderman, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Evans, C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Thielen.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to ENE/WTL, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 312).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, McDermott, Ohno, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamane voting no (20) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Johanson, Fukumoto; and Excused: none.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
2013-02-12HouseReported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-08HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Evans, Hanohano, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale.
2013-02-08HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Hanohano, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale.
2013-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-24HouseReferred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-22HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback