HI HB991 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 077, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Applies the protections of civil relief for state military forces to persons serving on full time National Guard duty under title 32 United States Code and aligns the HRS with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, codified in 50 United States Code chapter 50 (3901-4043). (HB991 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Military Forces.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 077, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
2019-06-12HouseAct 077, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, San Buenaventura, Gates; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 016.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Gates discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, McDermott.
2019-04-15HouseRe-referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 810) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2024) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 89).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1217 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback