HI HB994 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the suspension and expulsion of children participating in the Executive Office on Early Learning Public Prekindergarten Program, except in limited circumstances.
Title
Relating To Early Childhood Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB994 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1220 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB1220 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=994&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB994_.HTM |