HI HB997 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB997
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent Act 141, Sessions Laws of Hawaii 2009, which requires the county to issue affordable housing credits to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands. Makes permanent Act 98, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, which requires the counties to issue affordable housing credits for each residential unit developed by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing On Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB997 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1223 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 080, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
SB1223 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 080, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=997&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB997_.HTM |