HI HB998 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB998
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from the definition of "public lands" in section 171-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, lands set aside by the governor to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority (HPHA) or lands to which the HPHA holds title. Requires legislative approval of the sale of lands to which the HPHA holds title.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB998 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1224 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
SB1224 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSG/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=998&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB998_.HTM |