HI HCR100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Seek Assistance From The Federal Government To Fund Or Perform A Study On All Possible Transportation Options To Reduce Traffic Within The City And County Of Honolulu And In The Other Counties Of The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Seek Assistance From The Federal Government To Fund Or Perform A Study On All Possible Transportation Options To Reduce Traffic Within The City And County Of Honolulu And In The Other Counties Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 612). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1996), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1811), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR100 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.
HR93 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR93 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=100&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR100_.HTM |