HI HCR113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Convening The Multiple Languages Emergency Notification Working Group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening The Multiple Languages Emergency Notification Working Group.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 889).
2019-05-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 938) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-22SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2228) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 2:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to LCA.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 616).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1998), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR105 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback