HI HCR117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR117
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Foster A More Supportive Regulatory Structure And Environment For Licensed Or Certified Care Facilities, Including Adult Residential Care Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Community Care Foster Family Homes.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Foster A More Supportive Regulatory Structure And Environment For Licensed Or Certified Care Facilities, Including Adult Residential Care Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Community Care Foster Family Homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR98 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
HCR117 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Re-referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 38
HCR117 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Re-referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 38
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=117&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR117_.HTM |