HI HCR119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR119
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Marine Corps To Prepare An Environmental Impact Statement For The Shoreline Stabilization Project At The Puuloa Range Training Facility And Urging The Marine Corps To Consider Alternative Approaches To Coastline Management.
Title
Requesting The United States Marine Corps To Prepare An Environmental Impact Statement For The Shoreline Stabilization Project At The Puuloa Range Training Facility And Urging The Marine Corps To Consider Alternative Approaches To Coastline Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR100 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR119 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR119 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=119&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR119_.HTM |