HI HCR129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 759).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 759).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Health To Develop Partnerships To Address The Data Gap On Air, Surface Water, And Near Shore Effects Of Atrazine.
Title
Atrazine Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2013-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 728) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1611) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to ENE/HTH. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 677). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1671) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Thursday, 03-28-13 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR100 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=129&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR129_.HTM |