HI HCR135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR135
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 43
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 43
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Amend Its Administrative Rules To Allow For Commercial Sale Of Rabbit Meat For Consumption.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Amend Its Administrative Rules To Allow For Commercial Sale Of Rabbit Meat For Consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 43 |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR118 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 43
HCR135 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
HCR135 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=135&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR135_.HTM |