HI HCR15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging United States Customs And Border Protection And The Hawaii Narcotics Enforcement Division To Increase Canine Narcotic Contraband Detection Teams At The State's Ports Of Entry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging United States Customs And Border Protection And The Hawaii Narcotics Enforcement Division To Increase Canine Narcotic Contraband Detection Teams At The State's Ports Of Entry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 595).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2013), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 20
2019-02-04HouseOffered
2019-02-01HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback