HI HCR155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2185) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara.
2019-04-10SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to HWN.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 620).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2058), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
2019-03-22HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR142 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback