HI HCR158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The Commissioner Of Securities To Be Notified Of And Authorized To Attend Any Meeting At Which Public Employees Are Subject To A Broker-dealer Offering Brokerage Services To Those Public Employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The Commissioner Of Securities To Be Notified Of And Authorized To Attend Any Meeting At Which Public Employees Are Subject To A Broker-dealer Offering Brokerage Services To Those Public Employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 621).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2036), recommending adoption.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi.
2019-03-29HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724), recommending referral to CPC.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback