HI HCR161 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Determine The Scope And Specific Duties Of The Health Educator Profession.
Title
Health Educators; Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756). |
2013-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Ward excused (2). |
2013-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 731) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1604) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to CPN/WAM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1706) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR129 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=161&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR161_.HTM |