HI HCR166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR166
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education And The Hawaii State Teachers Association To Develop Strategies To Place Experienced Teachers In Hard-to-fill Schools Where Their Experience Is Most Needed.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education And The Hawaii State Teachers Association To Develop Strategies To Place Experienced Teachers In Hard-to-fill Schools Where Their Experience Is Most Needed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR145 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HCR166 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR166 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=166&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR166_.HTM |